VA SB64 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax exemption; certain data centers. Extends the sunset date for the sales and use tax exemption for certain data centers from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2035, and eliminates the sunset date of June 30, 2020, for provisions of the existing law that allow the owner of the data center to count the jobs created and investments made by tenants to count toward the overall jobs and investment criteria for the exemption. If an entity previously created 50 new jobs at a data center in the Commonwealth in order to qualify for the exemption, those 50 jobs may be relocated to a new data center in the Commonwealth with a capital investment of at least $500 million on or after July 1, 2016, and count toward the new jobs requirement for the new data center to qualify for the exemption. The bill also makes a technical correction regarding a subdivision that is erroneously set out twice in the Code.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption for certain data centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712) | |
2016-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 712 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (0-Y 40-N) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2016-02-29 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 7, 2016 | |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/29/16 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB64ER) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2016-02-24 | House | Passed House (97-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2016-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-22 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB64S1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105371D-S1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105371D-S1 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102384D |
Same As/Similar To
HB872 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)