VA HB735 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Eminent domain; offer to sell to former owner. Provides that a former owner may enter into a contractual agreement or agree to a contractual provision waiving his right to receive an offer of sale from a condemnor. Under current law, any agreement or provision waiving such right is void and unenforceable.
Title
Eminent domain; offer to sell to former owner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102937D |