VA HB722 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-20 - House: Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-20 - House: Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Newport News. Amends provisions related to the city's boundary by adding references to bodies of water located within the city or located between its territory and any other jurisdiction. The bill also removes a provision that requires certain procedural matters of council to take place on July 1.
Title
Charter; City of Newport News.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-20 | House: Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-20 | House: Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102615D |
Same As/Similar To
HB457 (Similar To) 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0426)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB722 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB722+hil |