VA HB679 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Providers of treatment for persons with opiate addiction; elimination of location restriction. Eliminates the requirement that a provider of treatment for persons with opiate addiction through the use of (i) methadone or (ii) opioid replacements other than opioid replacements approved for the treatment of opioid addiction by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration be located more than one-half mile from a public or private licensed day care center or a public or private K-12 school. This bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023, and is identical to
Title
Opioids; providers of treatment for addiction, conditions for initial licensure, location.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 512 (effective 1/1/23) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB679ER) |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Printed as engrossed 22101664D-E |
2022-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB679E |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101664D |
Same As/Similar To
SB300 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
SB300 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
SB300 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)