VA HB672 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB672
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
State, regional, and local planning; climate change. Establishes a policy of the Commonwealth to prevent and to minimize actions that contribute to the detrimental effects of climate change in the Commonwealth. The bill requires any state agency to examine any new regulation in furtherance of this policy. The bill requires local and regional planning commissions to consider the impacts from and causes of climate change in adopting a comprehensive plan, regional strategic plan, or zoning ordinance.
Title
State, regional, and local planning; climate change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20109090D-S1 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB672H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107166D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (12-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107166D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100292D |
Same As/Similar To
HB672 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2283 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2284 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 4209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 5515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |