VA HB672 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB672

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

State, regional, and local planning; climate change. Establishes a policy of the Commonwealth to prevent and to minimize actions that contribute to the detrimental effects of climate change in the Commonwealth. The bill requires any state agency to examine any new regulation in furtherance of this policy. The bill requires local and regional planning commissions to consider the impacts from and causes of climate change in adopting a comprehensive plan, regional strategic plan, or zoning ordinance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State, regional, and local planning; climate change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateContinued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 20109090D-S1
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-06HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
2020-02-05HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB672H1
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107166D-H1
2020-02-05HouseRead second time
2020-02-04HouseRead first time
2020-01-31HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2020-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107166D-H1
2020-01-29HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Land Use
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100292D

Same As/Similar To

HB672 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522200(n/a)See Bill Text
1522223(n/a)See Bill Text
1522283(n/a)See Bill Text
1522284(n/a)See Bill Text
1524209(n/a)See Bill Text
225515(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback