VA HB652 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB652
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Admission to bail; presumption of release on recognizance. Provides that a judicial officer shall release any person taken into custody by an arresting officer for any misdemeanor violation committed in such arresting officer's presence, except for violations of driving or operating a motor vehicle, watercraft, or motorboat while intoxicated, offenses that give rise to a rebuttable presumption against bail, or as otherwise provided in Title 46.2 (Motor Vehicles).
Title
Admission to bail; presumption of release on recognizance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104927D |
Same As/Similar To
HB652 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 120.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB652 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB652+hil |