VA HB652 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB652

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Admission to bail; presumption of release on recognizance. Provides that a judicial officer shall release any person taken into custody by an arresting officer for any misdemeanor violation committed in such arresting officer's presence, except for violations of driving or operating a motor vehicle, watercraft, or motorboat while intoxicated, offenses that give rise to a rebuttable presumption against bail, or as otherwise provided in Title 46.2 (Motor Vehicles). Admission to bail; presumption of release on recognizance. Provides that a judicial officer shall release any person taken into custody by an arresting officer for any misdemeanor violation committed in such arresting officer's presence, except for violations of driving or operating a motor vehicle, watercraft, or motorboat while intoxicated, offenses that give rise to a rebuttable presumption against bail, or as otherwise provided in Title 46.2 (Motor Vehicles).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Admission to bail; presumption of release on recognizance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-02-05HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-26HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104927D

Same As/Similar To

HB652 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192120(n/a)See Bill Text
192120.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192124(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback