VA HB639 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; disease presumptions; correctional officers. Adds correctional officers to the list of public safety employees who are entitled to a presumption that hypertension and heart disease and certain infectious diseases are occupational diseases compensable under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
Workers' compensation; disease presumptions, correctional officers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Workers Comp |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101359D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB639 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB639+hil |