VA HB594 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; return of security deposit. Requires the landlord to return the tenant's security deposit, minus any deductions or charges, within 45 days of the termination of the tenancy or the date the tenant vacates the dwelling unit, whichever occurs last. Under current law, the 45-day period to return the security deposit begins on the date of the termination of the tenancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; return of security deposit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)
2020-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 384 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-06HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-27HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB594ER)
2020-02-27HouseEnrolled
2020-02-24SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateRead third time
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101456D

Same As/Similar To

SB388 (Same As) 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511226(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB594&201+sum+HB594
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB594+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB594ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0384+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0054+HB0594
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0081+HB0594
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0238+HB0594
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0623+HB0594
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0168+HB0594
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB0594+HB0594
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0863HB0594+HB0594

Bill Comments

feedback