VA SB388 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; return of security deposit. Requires the landlord to return the tenant's security deposit, minus any deductions or charges, within 45 days of the termination of the tenancy or the date the tenant vacates the dwelling unit, whichever occurs last. Under current law, the 45-day period to return the security deposit begins on the date of the termination of the tenancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; return of security deposit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
2020-04-07 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB388ER)
2020-03-02SenateEnrolled
2020-02-25HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25HouseRead third time
2020-02-24HouseRead second time
2020-02-20HouseReported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2020-01-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-06SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102347D

Same As/Similar To

HB594 (Same As) 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0384)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511226(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback