VA HB459 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - VOTE: Defeated #2 (50-Y 50-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-15 - VOTE: Defeated #2 (50-Y 50-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing access to adjoining property to make improvements or repairs. Allows an owner or lessee of real property who seeks to improve, repair, or maintain his property, and the property is so situated that it is impossible to perform the improvements, repairs, or maintenance without entering adjoining property and permission to enter the adjoining property has been denied, to petition the circuit court for a license to enter the adjoining property for the purpose of performing the improvements, repairs, or maintenance. The petition and affidavits, if any, shall state the facts making such entry necessary and the date or dates on which entry is sought. The bill provides that such license shall be granted by the court in an appropriate case upon such terms as justice requires. Any such entry shall not be deemed a trespass and the licensee shall be liable to the adjoining owner or his lessee for actual damages occurring as a result of the entry.
Title
Real property; entering adjoining property to improve, etc., petitioning circuit court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Defeated #2 (50-Y 50-N) (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Defeated (48-Y 52-N) (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Defeated (48-Y 52-N) (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Defeated #2 (50-Y 50-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (50-Y 50-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2022-02-15 | House | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Defeated (48-Y 52-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (48-Y 52-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB459H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106246D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106246D-H1 |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101887D |