VA HB457 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Institutions of higher education; immunity from disciplinary action in certain cases involving a good faith report of an act of sexual violence. Includes the Virginia Military Institute Board of Visitors among the governing boards of public institutions of higher education that are each required to include as part of its policy, code, rules, or set of standards governing sexual violence a provision for immunity from disciplinary action for certain individuals who make good faith reports of acts of sexual violence. Under current law, the Virginia Military Institute Board of Visitors is exempted from such requirement. The bill also requires the governing board of each nonprofit private institution of higher education and each public institution of higher education to include as part of its policy, code, rules, or set of standards governing sexual violence a provision for immunity from disciplinary action based on curfew violation in any case in which disclosure of such violation is made in conjunction with a good faith report of an act of sexual violence. Under current law, such boards are only required to include such a provision for immunity from disciplinary action based on personal consumption of drugs or alcohol.
Title
Higher educational institutions; immunity from disciplinary action in certain cases.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Education |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100928D |