VA HB457 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Degree-granting postsecondary schools; distance learning reciprocity agreements; consumer protection. Requires any degree-granting postsecondary school providing distance learning to residents of the Commonwealth from a location outside of the Commonwealth to be certified to operate in the Commonwealth or be a participant in any interstate reciprocity agreement to which the Commonwealth belongs, in accordance with the State Council of Higher Education's authority under relevant law, for the purpose of consumer protection. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022.
Title
Postsecondary schools; distance learning, certification and reciprocity, effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380) | |
2020-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 380 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB457ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB457H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106010D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106010D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103280D |