VA HB418 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Civil actions filed on behalf of multiple persons; class actions. Provides that one or more members of a class may, as representative parties on behalf of all members, bring a civil action or may be proceeded against in a civil action, provided that (i) the class is so numerous that joinder of all members or proceeding with such actions on an individual basis is impracticable or contrary to judicial economy; (ii) there are questions of law or fact common to the class; (iii) the claims or defenses of the representative parties are typical of the claims or defenses of the class; and (iv) the representative parties shall fairly and adequately protect the interests of the class. The bill further sets out the procedure to certify a class action, the duties of counsel appointed in a class action, the various orders a court may issue during the course of a class action, and the process by which a settlement, voluntary dismissal, or compromise may occur. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2025, and is identical to
Title
Civil actions filed on behalf of multiple persons; types of class actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 46-N) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 46-N) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-03-14 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB418ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24107726D-S1 (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 18-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB418S1 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107726D-S1 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107726D-S1 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (7-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-09 | House | VOTE: Passage (50-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB418H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106134D-H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 9-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 10-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2024-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106134D-H1 |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104551D |
Same As/Similar To
SB259 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Senate sustained Governor's veto