VA HB365 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Learning assessments; revisions. Requires that all revisions to any Standards of Learning assessment are finalized by December 31 of the school year prior to the school year in which the revised assessment is administered.
Title
Standards of Learning; assessments, revisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101869D |