VA HB2111 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0479)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0479)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hunting, trapping, or fishing licenses; electronic copies. Allows a person who is required to carry certain hunting, trapping, or fishing licenses or a hunter education certificate to meet the requirement by carrying an electronic copy of the relevant license or certificate. The bill requires a license for bear, deer, or turkey to be carried in hard copy.
Title
Hunting, trapping, or fishing licenses; electronic copies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0479) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 479 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2111ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101364D |