VA HB2106 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation of traffic. Conforms Title 46.2 (Motor Vehicles) of the Code of Virginia to recent changes to the Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices.
Title
Traffic regulation; conforms Title 46.2 to changes to Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128) | |
2013-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 128 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2106ER) |
2013-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 13103604D-E |
2013-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2106E |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103604D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1200 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 821 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 822 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 826 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 830 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 831 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 832 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 833 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 834 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 835 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 836 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 846 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |