VA SB1200 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation of traffic. Conforms Title 46.2 (Motor Vehicles) of the Code of Virginia to recent changes to the Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices.
Title
Traffic regulation; conforms Title 46.2 to changes to Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0400) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 400 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1200ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #2 |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13103594D-E |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1200E |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103594D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2106 (Same As) 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 821 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 822 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 826 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 830 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 831 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 832 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 833 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 834 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 835 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 836 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 846 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |