VA HB2006 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; public records charges; electronic payment method. Provides that any local public body that charges for the production of public records pursuant to the Virginia Freedom of Information Act may provide an electronic method of payment through which all payments for the production of such records to such locality may be made.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; public records charges, electronic payment method.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 534 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2006ER) |
2023-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Printed as reengrossed 23100202D-E2 |
2023-02-01 | House | Reengrossed by House as amended HB2006E2 |
2023-02-01 | House | Amendments by Delegate Roem agreed to |
2023-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | House | Engrossment reconsidered by House |
2023-01-31 | House | Printed as engrossed 23100202D-E |
2023-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2006E |
2023-01-31 | House | Amendment by Delegate Simon agreed to |
2023-01-31 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2023-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100202D |