VA HB1869 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
General Assembly; general appropriation bills. Requires the Chairman of the House Appropriations Committee and the Chairman of the Senate Finance Committee to issue reports concurrently with the budget conference report that specifically identify (i) any nonstate appropriation, (ii) any item in the conference report that was not included in a general appropriation bill as passed by either the House or the Senate, and (iii) any item that represents legislation that failed in either house during the regular or a special session.
Title
General Assembly; reports to accompany general appropriation bills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight and Government Activities | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101492D |