VA HB1598 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Standards and criteria for congressional and state legislative districts. Provides criteria by which congressional and state legislative districts are to be drawn, including equal population, racial and ethnic fairness, respect for existing political boundaries, contiguity, compactness, and communities of interest. The criteria set out would apply to those districts drawn following the 2020 United States Census and thereafter. This bill is identical to SB 106.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congressional and state legislative districts; standards and criteria.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 51-N) (Y: 48 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (49-Y 50-N) (Y: 49 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18HouseCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 51-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (48-Y 51-N)
2018-04-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-06HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
2018-03-03SenateSigned by President
2018-02-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-28HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1598ER)
2018-02-28HouseEnrolled
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2018-02-26SenateRead third time
2018-02-23SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18105613D-E
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1598E
2018-02-12HouseVOTE: REJECTED (49-Y 50-N)
2018-02-12HouseAmendment by Delegate Toscano rejected (49-Y 50-N)
2018-02-12HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N)
2018-01-23HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2018-01-19HousePresented and ordered printed 18105613D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242304.04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1598
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1598+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1598E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1598ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1801V0015+HB1598
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H18V0028+HB1598
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0572+HB1598
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0763+HB1598
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S08V0114+HB1598
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0639HB1598+HB1598
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0704HB1598+HB1598
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1664+HB1598

Bill Comments

feedback