VA HB1593 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-09 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-09 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Standards for accreditation; school accreditation review frequency. Eliminates the requirement that the Board of Education perform a triennial review of the accreditation status of a public school that has been fully accredited for three consecutive years. The bill also eliminates the provision permitting the Board to do a review of the accreditation status of any other school once every two or three years and the requirement that any such school receiving a multiyear accreditation status other than full accreditation be covered by a Board-approved multiyear corrective action plan. Under the bill, the Board is required to review annually the accreditation status of all schools in the Commonwealth.
Title
Standards for accreditation; school accreditation review frequency.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 18-N) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 18-N) (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-27 | House | VOTE: Passage (80-Y 18-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 18-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2023-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101185D |