VA HB1580 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Violation of protective order or stalking; third or subsequent offense; penalty. Expands the offenses for which a conviction of a third or subsequent offense, when the offense is committed within 20 years of the first conviction and when either the instant or one of the prior offenses was based on an act or threat of violence and the instant and prior offenses arise out of separate incidents, is a Class 6 felony with a mandatory minimum term of confinement of six months from violating a protective order to any combination of violating a protective order or stalking.
Title
Violation of protective order or stalking; third or subsequent offense, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Failed to pass |
2018-03-10 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, McDougle, Edwards |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: Cline, Bell, Robert B., Bourne |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 18107906D-S2 (0-Y 96-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1580S2 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107906D-S2 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 18107678D-S1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107906D-S2 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107678D-S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 10-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105108D |