VA HB1433 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Line of Duty Act; eligible dependent. Provides that for purposes of continued health insurance pursuant to the Line of Duty Act, an eligible dependent means the natural or adopted child or children of a deceased person or disabled person or of a deceased or disabled person's eligible spouse, provided that any such natural child is born as the result of a pregnancy that occurred prior to, or no later than six months after, the time of the employee's death or disability and that any such adopted child is (i) adopted prior to, or no later than six months after, the time of the employee's death or disability or (ii) adopted more than six months after the employee's death or disability if the adoption is pursuant to a preadoptive agreement entered into prior to, or no later than six months after, the death or disability. Under current law, an eligible dependent includes a child born or adopted prior to the time of the employee's death or disability. The bill's provisions only apply to an eligible dependent of a deceased person or disabled person when such death or disability occurred on or after July 1, 2017, and the bill specifies that any new health insurance coverage for those qualifying as an eligible dependent is only prospective from July 1, 2024. Line of Duty Act; eligible dependent. Provides that for purposes of continued health insurance pursuant to the Line of Duty Act, an eligible dependent means the natural or adopted child or children of a deceased person or disabled person or of a deceased or disabled person's eligible spouse, provided that any such natural child is born as the result of a pregnancy that occurred prior to, or no later than six months after, the time of the employee's death or disability and that any such adopted child is (i) adopted prior to, or no later than six months after, the time of the employee's death or disability or (ii) adopted more than six months after the employee's death or disability if the adoption is pursuant to a preadoptive agreement entered into prior to, or no later than six months after, the death or disability. Under current law, an eligible dependent includes a child born or adopted prior to the time of the employee's death or disability. The bill's provisions only apply to an eligible dependent of a deceased person or disabled person when such death or disability occurred on or after July 1, 2017, and the bill specifies that any new health insurance coverage for those qualifying as an eligible dependent is only prospective from July 1, 2024.
Title
Line of Duty Act; clarifies definition of eligible dependent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 560 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1433ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2024-03-07 | House | Delegates: Reid, Glass, Hodges |
2024-03-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senators: Salim, Stuart, Reeves |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | House acceded to request |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 24108805D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1433S1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108805D-S1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108805D-S1 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-09 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104691D |