VA HB1378 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0870)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0870)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; pilot program for the use of biometric data. Requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to design and develop a plan for a pilot program for the use of biometric data to identify medical assistance services recipients and link services rendered to specific recipients, in order to (i) increase the quality of care provided to recipients of medical assistance services; (ii) improve the accuracy and efficiency in billing for medical assistance services by providers; and (iii) reduce the potential for identity theft and the unlawful use of recipients' identifying information.
Title
Medical Assistance Services, Department of; establishing pilot program for use of biometric data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-13 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (3-Y 94-N) (Y: 3 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-13 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (3-Y 94-N) (Y: 3 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0870) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 870 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1378ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1378ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-13 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Senators: Marsh, Lucas, Whipple | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2010-03-11 | House: Delegates: Sickles, Nixon, Orrock | |
2010-03-11 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2010-03-11 | House: House acceded to request | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (3-Y 94-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Senate amendment #5 rejected by House (3-Y 94-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Senate amendments #'s1, 2, 3 and 4 agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1378H2 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 10105337D-H2 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute from Health, Welfare and Institutions rejected 10104818D-H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105337D-H2 | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-02-04 | House: Assigned App. sub: Health and Human Resources | |
2010-02-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104818D-H1 | |
2010-02-04 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #2 | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103633D |