VA HB1331 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Retrieving hunting dogs, falcons, hawks, or owls. Prohibits a person who has been convicted of trespassing or trespassing to hunt, fish, or trap on posted lands from going on prohibited lands to retrieve a hunting dog, falcon, hawk, or owl without the written permission of the landowner or his agent. A violation of the provisions of the bill is a Class 4 misdemeanor and a person found guilty shall have the allowance to retrieve revoked for five years.
Title
Hunting dogs, falcons, hawks, or owls; retrieving on posted lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 43-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 43-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22103697D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1331E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (13-Y 7-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103697D |