VA HB1303 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; Virginia Parole Board member votes. Provides that individual votes of the members of the Virginia Parole Board are public records and subject to the provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; Virginia Parole Board member votes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 25 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11. 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1303ER) |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (95-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1303H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106431D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106431D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104931D |
Same As/Similar To
SB5 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0026)
SB5 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0026)
SB5 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0026)