VA SB5 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0026)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0026)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; Virginia Parole Board member votes. Provides that individual votes of the members of the Virginia Parole Board are public records and subject to the provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; Virginia Parole Board member votes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0026) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 26 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5ER) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-11-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100574D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1303 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
HB1303 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
HB1303 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)