VA HB1303 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; release of Standards of Learning assessments. Requires the Department of Education to make available to school divisions Standards of Learning assessments typically administered by the middle and high schools by December 1 of the school year in which such assessments are to be administered or when newly developed assessments are available, whichever is later.
Title
Local school boards; administration of Standards of Learning assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0558) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 558 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1303ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1303H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104700D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104700D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-11-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100234D |
Same As/Similar To
SB900 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 298.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |