VA HB1151 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Requires 21 affirmative votes for passage
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Requires 21 affirmative votes for passage
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Plastic bag tax; use of revenues. Allows localities to impose a five-cent ($0.05) per bag tax on plastic bags provided to customers by retailers in grocery stores, convenience stores, restaurants, or drugstores. Certain products are exempt from the tax. The bill directs revenue from the local tax to be deposited into the Virginia Water Quality Improvement Fund and the Virginia Natural Resources Commitment Fund. The bill allows every restaurant or retailer that collects the tax to retain one cent of the five-cent tax if the tax is paid in a timely manner.
Title
Plastic bag tax; use of revenues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 46-N) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 46-N) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Requires 21 affirmative votes for passage |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1151S1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108919D-S1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108919D-S1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (50-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1151H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107423D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Incorporates HB1673 (Ware) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107423D-H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101671D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1673 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Finance