VA HB1673 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Plastic bag tax; use of revenues. Allows localities to impose a five-cent ($0.05) per bag tax on plastic bags provided to customers by retailers in grocery stores, convenience stores, or drugstores in the Commonwealth. The bill also (i) requires every retailer to provide recycling receptacles at its place of business for such disposable plastic bags and (ii) allows every retailer that collects the tax to retain one cent ($0.01) of every five cents ($0.05) collected. The tax is to be administered in the same manner as the retail sales and use tax, and all revenues from the tax shall be deposited in equal sums into the Virginia Water Quality Improvement Fund and the Virginia Natural Resources Commitment Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plastic bag tax; use of revenues.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HouseIncorporated by Finance
2020-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1151-Lopez) by voice vote
2020-01-29HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 20104420D

Same As/Similar To

HB1151 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Requires 21 affirmative votes for passage

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5811745(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback