VA HB1061 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Breeding dogs or cats for foreign animal testing facility prohibited; penalty. Prohibits a person from breeding or raising a dog or cat for the purpose of selling or transferring the dog or cat, or its offspring, to an animal testing facility outside of the United States. A violation of the bill is a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Breeding dogs or cats for foreign animal testing facility; prohibited, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102693D |