VA HB1036 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Corporation Commission; availability of records. Requires the State Corporation Commission to make available for public inspection records that are related to matters related to the Commission's operational responsibilities and operational functions, including revenues, expenditures, financial management and budgetary practices, personnel policies and practices, and procurement policies and practices. Disclosure of the records is not required if the records are otherwise covered by applicable legal privileges; disclosure of such records could threaten the safety or security of the Commission's employees, physical plant, or information technology assets or data; or the records are not publicly available from other public entities. In addition, the requirement does not apply to records related to the Commission's formal or informal regulatory or legal proceedings or activities. The Commission is required to respond within five business days of receiving requests for administrative records, which may be extended by an additional seven business days if it is impracticable to provide the records requested within that time period. If the scope of the records requested or length of search necessitates, additional time is allowed. When requested records are not provided, the Commission shall notify the requester of the basis of the denial. Records held by the clerk of the Commission related to business entities shall be made public or held confidential in accordance with laws and regulations applicable specifically to such records.
Title
State Corporation Commission; availability of records.
Sponsors
Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. Johnny Joannou [D] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. David Ramadan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0347) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 347 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1036ER) |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-27 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 6-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102997D-E |
2014-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1036E |
2014-01-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-21 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (19-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102997D |
Same As/Similar To
SB119 (Same As) 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0174)