VA HB1 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Minimum wage. Increases the minimum wage from the current rate of $12.00 per hour to $13.50 per hour effective January 1, 2025, and to $15.00 per hour effective January 1, 2026. The bill satisfies a reenactment clause included in Chapters 1204 and 1242 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum wage; increases wage to $13.50 per hour effective January 1, 2025.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-28HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1ER)
2024-02-28HouseEnrolled
2024-02-23SenatePassed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2024-02-23SenateRead third time
2024-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2024-02-21SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 4-N)
2024-02-19SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2024-02-19SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 5-N)
2024-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2024-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2024-02-02HouseVOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N)
2024-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 49-N)
2024-02-01HouseRead second time and engrossed
2024-01-31HouseRead first time
2024-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations (11-Y 10-N)
2024-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2024-01-21HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2024-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2024-01-18HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N)
2023-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2023-11-20HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100469D

Same As/Similar To

SB1 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1ER)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.10(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB1
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1ER+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H14V0011+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H0201V0005+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H02V0016+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+HV0202+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S02V0081+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S05V0350+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0544HB0001+HB0001
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0582HB0001+HB0001

Bill Comments

feedback