UT SR0002 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Rules Resolution - Standing Committee Modifications
Title
Senate Rules Resolution - Standing Committee Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-02 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Resolutions
Resolutions, Rules
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Resolutions
Resolutions, Rules