UT SB3005 | 2011 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-20 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-20 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lieutenant Governor District Determinations
Title
Lieutenant Governor District Determinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-20 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2011-10-19 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-10-19 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-10-19 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-10-19 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-10-18 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-10-18 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-10-17 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-10-17 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-10-17 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-10-17 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-10-17 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-10-17 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-10-17 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2011-10-17 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-10-17 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-10-17 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-10-17 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2011-10-17 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-10-17 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND | |
2011-10-17 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND | |
2011-10-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND | |
2011-10-17 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-10-17 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-10-17 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-10-17 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-10-17 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-10-17 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-10-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011S3/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB3005.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011S3/bills/sbillint/sb3005.pdf |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011S3/bills/sbillenr/sb3005.pdf |