UT SB0288 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Immigration Enforcement Amendments
Title
Utah Immigration Enforcement Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSUB | |
2011-03-03 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSUB | |
2011-03-01 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTREV | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-25 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0288.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/sbillint/sb0288.pdf |