UT SB0269S01 | 2014 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation SB0269

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Became Law w/o Governor Signature in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Annual Leave Program II for State Employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annual Leave Program II for State Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-02 Became Law w/o Governor Signature in LTGOV
2014-03-21 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2014-03-21SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2014-03-20SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2014-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2014-03-18 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2014-03-16 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in H3RDSB
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2014-03-13HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2014-03-12HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2014-03-10HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-03-10HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2014-03-10HouseSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK
2014-03-10HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2014-03-10HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK
2014-03-10SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2014-03-07SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-03-07SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTREV
2014-03-07SenateBill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTREV
2014-03-07SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTREV
2014-03-07SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTREV
2014-03-07SenateLFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTREV
2014-03-05SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTREV
2014-03-05SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2014-03-05SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2014-03-04 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-03-04 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

SB0269 (Replaces) 2014-03-07 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback