UT SB0269 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0269S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-07 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-07 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Annual Leave Program II for State Employees
Title
Annual Leave Program II for State Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTREV |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTREV |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-03-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-03-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-03-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0269S01 (Replaced by) 2014-04-02 - Became Law w/o Governor Signature in LTGOV
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0269.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillint/sb0269.pdf |