UT SB0208 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Employee Medical Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employee Medical Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2021-03-01SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-03-01SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-28SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-26SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2021-02-26SenateSenate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-26SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-25SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-23SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-02-23SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-23SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-23SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-18SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-17SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-17SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-17 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-02-17 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/SB0208.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0208.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillamd/SB0208.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0208S01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/sb0208.sca.01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/sb0208.sca.02.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/sb0208s01.sfa.01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0208.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0208.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0208S01_ComparedWith_SB0208.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0208S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0208S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0208S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/sbillint/SB0208S02_ComparedWith_SB0208S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/SB0208S02.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20096
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20100
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1088&house=S

Bill Comments 750

feedback