UT SB0180 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0180S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-13 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property Tax Modifications
Title
Property Tax Modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTREV |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTREV |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTREV |
2014-02-12 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTREV |
2014-02-11 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTREV |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0180S01 (Replaced by) 2014-03-31 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0180.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillint/sb0180.pdf |