UT SB0158 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Statutory Supremacy over Administrative Rules
Title
Statutory Supremacy over Administrative Rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Government Operations (State Issues)
Legislative Oversight of Administrative Rules
Rulemaking Procedures
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Government Operations (State Issues)
Legislative Oversight of Administrative Rules
Rulemaking Procedures