UT SB0102 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband Service Modifications
Title
Broadband Service Modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Kwan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-17 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 19 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 19 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/SB0102.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/sbillint/SB0102.pdf |