UT SB0080 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Antidiscrimination Act Amendments
Title
Utah Antidiscrimination Act Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-14 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-11 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |