UT SB0055 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bear Lake Preservation Amendments
Title
Bear Lake Preservation Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-03 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |