UT SB0051 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Amendments
Title
Transportation Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-01 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-01 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-28 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate President |
2022-02-27 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate President |
2022-02-25 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-02-25 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2022-02-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-24 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-24 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-24 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-23 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-04 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Substituted Bill |
2022-02-03 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-19 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-19 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-12-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Attorney General
Constitutional Officers
Department of Public Safety
Emissions Control
Government Operations (State Issues)
Local Option Sales Taxes
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles
Public Transit
Towing
Transportation
Utah Highway Patrol
Vehicle Registration
Constitutional Officers
Department of Public Safety
Emissions Control
Government Operations (State Issues)
Local Option Sales Taxes
Motor Vehicles
Motorcycles
Public Transit
Towing
Transportation
Utah Highway Patrol
Vehicle Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 21 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 3 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 3 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 3 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 2220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63B | 31 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 272 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 2 | 272 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 1 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 2 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 2 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 5 | 309 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 5 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |