UT HJR022 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution - Inherent and Inalienable Rights
Title
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution - Inherent and Inalienable Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Lyman [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - House/ failed (Y: 24 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-27 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2023-02-27 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-24 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-02-24 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |