UT HCR018 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce Needs Concurrent Resolution
Title
Workforce Needs Concurrent Resolution
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Dee [R] | Sen. Scott Jenkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-11 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-11 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-10 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-03-08 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-03-05 | House/ under suspension of the rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-05 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-04 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-03-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |