UT HB0494 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Justice Courts
Title
Justice Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2011-03-09 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-03-07 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-03-07 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-02 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2011-03-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |